skip to content

Murphy, Desmond Michael

CPSO#: 89713

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009