skip to content

Murphy, Deanna Marie

CPSO#: 87800

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Oct 2007 to 09 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2009 to 29 May 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012