skip to content

Murphy, Charles Daniel

CPSO#: 22685

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994