skip to content

Murphy, Amanda Marie

CPSO#: 93669

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000 Ext. 6186 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Murphy ( CPSO# 93325 )
Dr. A. Murphy ( CPSO# 93669 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, Donnely Wing
4th Floor, Room 4-072B
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
4001 Leslie St
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: 416-756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDA MARIE MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2015