skip to content

Murnaghan, John James

CPSO#: 51435

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Orthopaedic and Arthritic C
43 Wellesley Street East
Apartment 319
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8778
Fax: (416) 967-8780 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John J. Murnaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Murnaghan ( CPSO# 51435 )

Business Address:
Holland Orthopaedic and Arthritic Center
319-43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8778


Corporation Name: O. Murnaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chambers ( CPSO# 95989 )
Dr. J. Murnaghan ( CPSO# 51435 )
Dr. O. Murnaghan ( CPSO# 100568)

Business Address:
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
16-1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 231-1555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN JAMES MURNAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURNAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1985