skip to content

Murdock, Alan Irving

CPSO#: 22277

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1986