skip to content

Murdoch, James Cameron

CPSO#: 97569

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
83 Dawson Road, Suite 101
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: 519-766-1360
Fax: 519-763-4315 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Murdoch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 97569 )

Business Address:
101 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES CAMERON MURDOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURDOCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017