skip to content

Muraca, Sergio

CPSO#: 84687

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Jan 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 984-6375 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 984-6375
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (416) 984-6375
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 984-6375
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2017 Active
             Dr. Sergio Muraca may practise medicine as a surgical assistant only.