skip to content

Mura, Marco

CPSO#: 92049

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Jul 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Bologna, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E6 203
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6744
Fax: (519) 685-8406 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marco Mura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mura ( CPSO# 92049 )

Business Address:
Suite E6 203
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6K 4V3
Phone Number: (519) 667-6744


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2009 to 25 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2009 to 07 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Marco Mura may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Respirology,  University of Western Ontario, in which
                        Dr. Mura holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Mura  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.