skip to content

Munzar, Jonathan Chanler

CPSO#: 100314

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maple
NA-House Calls
Toronto ON  M5V 1S2
Canada
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN CHANLER MUNZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNZAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015