skip to content

Munshi, Tariq Allauddin

CPSO#: 90302

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3080
Fax: (416) 864-5445 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sea Shell Medical
112-330 Bronte Street South
Milton
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Canada
Phone: (905) 693-6733
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Phone: 416-864-5127
Fax: 4165645727
County: 
Electoral District: 

30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 4168645137
Fax: 4165645727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tariq Munshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Munshi ( CPSO# 90302 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3080

Business Address:
SeaShell Medical
330 Bronte Street South
Suite 113
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone Number: (905) 693-6733


Corporation Name: Syed Hashmatullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Munshi ( CPSO# 90302 )
Dr. S. Hashmatullah ( CPSO# 102007)

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Psychiatry
P.O. Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2015 Active
             Dr. Tariq Allauddin Munshi may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.