skip to content

Munroe, Sarah Anne

CPSO#: 93094

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Canada
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough Health Network
General hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount hospital
3030 Birchmount Rd.
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Munroe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Munroe ( CPSO# 93094 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3

Business Address:
47 Liberty St South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE MUNROE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNROE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2012