skip to content

Mullings, Kadir Owen

CPSO#: 93497

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Sep 2010
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 29 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016