Mullen, Sarah Jane (CPSO#: 100777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
2757 King St E
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-7777
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Baraniecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mullen ( CPSO# 100777)
Dr. R. Baraniecki ( CPSO# 95091 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: S. Mullen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mullen ( CPSO# 100777)
Dr. R. Baraniecki ( CPSO# 95091 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Residency Program-Ophthalmology
King Campus Room 2500
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
Suite 102
835 Paramount Drive
Hamilton ON  L8J 0B4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH JANE MULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018