skip to content

Mullan, Michael John

CPSO#: 30366

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 04 Jun 2010 Active
             As from June 4, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael John Mullan,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mullan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Mullan has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges with
                  respect to the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in
                  the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and
                  summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
            Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                  X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: September 21, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)