skip to content

Mulholland, Robert Stephen

CPSO#: 59297

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4471 Dean Martin Dr
Las Vegas NV  89103-4251
United States
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Although Dr. Stephen Mulholland, as of May 2021, has retired from active practice, his offices, SpaMedica Plastic Surgery, located at 66 Avenue Road, Suite 4, Toronto, remain open. A new Medical Director and CPSO certified Plastic Surgeon, Dr. Thomas Bell, has taken over the practice to manage all new referrals and prior patient care. The office number is 416-922-3743 and please ask for Clinic Manager, Leesa Richardson. All medical records are securely stored and follow the rules and regulations of the College of Physician and Surgeons of Ontario.
Date Received: 31 May 2022


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 May 1988 to 12 Jun 1988
EL - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2022