skip to content

Mule, Francesco

CPSO#: 93009

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 3777763
Fax: (905) 3736933 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lemon-Mule Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lemon-Mule ( CPSO# 92221 )
Dr. F. Mule ( CPSO# 93009 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4980

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7768

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:07 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
 Dr.  Francesco  Mule may practise medicine independently in Emergency Medicine,
            only.