skip to content

Mulaosmanovic, Armin

CPSO#: 99367

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Roseland After Hours Medical Clinic
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone: 5199723944 Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARMIN MULAOSMANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULAOSMANOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2014