skip to content

Mukherji, Atreyi

CPSO#: 67028

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Aug 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ELM Medicine
Unit 4
1521 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J4
Phone: (905) 318-3006
Fax: 833-268-3660 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Mukherji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mukherji ( CPSO# 67028 )

Business Address:
AVIVA Medical Diagnostic and Specialty Clinic
SouthMount Medical Center
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Business Address:
203-180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (833) 962-5359

Business Address:
2951 Walkers Line
Main Floor
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (833) 962-5359

Business Address:
Suite 4
1521 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8J 3W4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ATREYI MUKHERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHERJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1997