skip to content

Muise, Suzanne Lesley

CPSO#: 89882

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Suzanne Muise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: 189 Elm Street St. Thomas, ON N5R 5C4 Telephone: 519-633-9292 Fax: 519-633-9413
Date Received: 28 Mar 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:21 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014