skip to content

Muhammad, Naeem Hafiz

CPSO#: 86129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Urdu

Education:University of the Punjab, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1121 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2N4
Phone: (519) 471-1800
Fax: (519) 471-1801 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naeem Muhammad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Muhammad ( CPSO# 86129 )

Business Address:
1 - 844 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 2V8
Phone Number: (519) 471-1800

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests for copies of medical records should be submitted in person or via mail to: Dr. Naeem Muhammad, 1121 Adelaide Street North, London, ON, N5Y 2N4
Date Received: 18 Oct 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAEEM HAFIZ MUHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHAMMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 18 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Feb 2013
Summary:

On February 14, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Naeem Hafiz Muhammad 
committed professional misconduct:  in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and, 
in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Muhammad is a family physician and jointly owned two walk-in clinics. Ms X was a 
part-time employee at the walk-in clinics. In addition, although Ms X had her own family doctor, 
she attended Dr. Muhammad as a patient in the clinics for episodic, minor complaints on five 
occasions between December 2009 and July 2010 at the time she was working a shift. Dr. 
Muhammad did not deny that there was an ongoing doctor-patient relationship. 
 
The Committee found that: 
 
      Ms X was a patient of Dr. Muhammad from December 2009 to September 2010; 
      prior to September 2010, Dr. Muhammad engaged in conduct that was disgraceful, 
      dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his relationship with Ms X by making 
      inappropriate comments to and about her; and, 
      on a date in September 2010, while Ms X was working at Dr. Muhammad's clinic, Dr. 
      Muhammad made inappropriate and sexual comments to her and engaged in sexual abuse 
      of her, including by touching her lips, hugging and kissing her and that this constituted 
      the sexual abuse of a patient. 
 
On May 9, 2013, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Muhammad's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      months commencing immediately. 
      the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on the certificate of 
      registration of Dr. Muhammad: 
 
      i.    Dr.  Muhammad shall complete, at his own expense, College-facilitated 
            instruction in communications as set out in the Individualized Education Plan 
            attached at Appendix A to the Order. 
 
      Dr. Muhammad attend before the panel to be reprimanded.  
      Dr. Muhammad reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the 
            program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter 
      of credit or other security acceptable to the College, by July 9, 2013, in the amount of 
      $16,060.00. 
      Dr. Muhammad pay costs to the College in the amount of $25,550.00, by July 9,  2013. 
 
On May 9, 2013, Dr. Muhammad appealed the finding decision of the Discipline Committee to 
the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s.25(1) of the Statutory Powers 
Procedure Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee is stayed pending the outcome of the 
appeal. 
 
On June 18, 2014, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Muhammad's appeal. Therefore, the 
decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect. 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 09 May 2013
Hearing Date(s): November 13-16, November 29-30, 2012