skip to content

Muhammad, Amin Ali

CPSO#: 91940

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 May 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 289-398-1009 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Arts Building
Suite 409
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 997-8182
Fax: (905) 997-8183
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amin Muhammad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Muhammad ( CPSO# 91940 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
409 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 997-8182


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Newfoundland and Labrador

Pakistan

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Mar 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMIN ALI MUHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHAMMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2010

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)