skip to content

Mughal, Maqbool Ahmed

CPSO#: 28522

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University College of East Africa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Incorporated 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Website: http://docudavit.com Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016