skip to content

Muftah, Salmin Issa M

CPSO#: 85617

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Oct 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Garyounis University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
PEAP - R - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 23 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2007 to 23 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2010 to 12 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011