skip to content

Mueller-Wilm, Ingrid

CPSO#: 18135

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 24-Nov-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 21038 Guelph, ON M1G 4T3
Instructions: Patients may contact Dr. Wilm at the address listed above.
Date Received: 18 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016