skip to content

Mueller, Elizabeth Katharina

CPSO#: 31281

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jan 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Stirling MacGregor Dr
Cambridge ON  N1S 5B7
Phone: (519) 622 3434 Ext. 261
Fax: (519) 622 7592 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E. K. Mueller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mueller ( CPSO# 31281 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: 11 George Street South Cambridge ON N1S 2N3
Instructions: Patients looking to request copies of their medical records can write to the address provided
Date Received: 16 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH KATHARINA MUELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUELLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1998