skip to content

Muamenah, Hane Mohammad S

CPSO#: 92027

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2009 to 30 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2010 to 30 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2011 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2017