skip to content

Moylan, Beverly Amanda Oudkerk

CPSO#: 92757

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehab
150 Kilgour Rd
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: 416-425-6220
Fax: 416-425-6591 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Treatment Network
13175 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0G6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-4779
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Toronto Rehab - Rumsey Centre
345 Rumsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R7
Canada
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 5370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Ave
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 243-3600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Beverly Moylan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moylan ( CPSO# 92757 )

Business Address:
10145 McVean Drive
Brampton ON  L6P 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 855-2690

Business Address:
1230 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E5
Phone Number: (905) 855-2419

Business Address:
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 425-6220

Business Address:
100-255 Consumers Road
North York ON  M2J 1R4

Business Address:
13175 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0G6
Phone Number: (905) 773-4779

Business Address:
82 Button Wood Avenue
York ON  M6M 2J5

Business Address:
347 Rumsey Road
East York ON  M4G 2V6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEVERLY AMANDA OUDKERK MOYLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2016