skip to content

Movsesyan, Arakel

CPSO#: 97316

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Russian

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gage Medical clinic
1050 Upper Gage ave unit 3
Hamilton ON  L8V5B7
Phone: (905) 393-6520
Fax: (905) 393-0818 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arakel Movsesyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Movsesyan ( CPSO# 97316 )

Business Address:
Gage Medical Clinic
3 - 1050 Upper Gage Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 5B7
Phone Number: (905) 393-6520

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2014 Active
 Dr.  Arakel  Movsesyan  may  practise medicine independently in family medicine
            only.