skip to content

Moussa, Bassem Gamal Fahmy

CPSO#: 85155

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Oct 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bassem Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moussa ( CPSO# 85155 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BASSEM GAMAL FAHMY MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009