skip to content

Mousavi, Negareh

CPSO#: 85835

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: 5149341934

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 02 Jan 2007 to 31 Jan 2007
EL - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2012 Active
             Dr.  Negareh  Mousavi  may practice medicine independently in internal medicine
            and cardiology, only.