skip to content

Mousa, Hanan Mohammed G H

CPSO#: 97217

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2012 to 01 Apr 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014