skip to content

Mourant, Lindsay Michelle

CPSO#: 96433

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 18 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2018