skip to content

Mountifield, Nigel David

CPSO#: 21700

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2005