skip to content

Moulin, Jana Marie

CPSO#: 88531

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wonderland Medicentres
1375 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON  N6H 0J1
Phone: (519) 471-6686
Fax: (519) 471-2801 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANA MARIE MOULIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOULIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2010