skip to content

Mottiar, Miriam Annice Janet

CPSO#: 90697

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 737 8187 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mottiar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mottiar ( CPSO# 90697 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Rd
Department of Anesthesiology & Pain Medicine
CCW 1401
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: 613 737 8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:31 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIRIAM ANNICE JANET MOTTIAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTTIAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014