skip to content

Mottaghian, Mozhdeh

CPSO#: 96375

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: 7054356281 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mozhdeh Mottaghian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mottaghian ( CPSO# 96375 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: 519 941 2410

Business Address:
1-200 Fletcher Cres
Alliston ON  L9R 1M1
Phone Number: 7054356281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOZHDEH MOTTAGHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTTAGHIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2013