skip to content

Mossanda Chabikuli, Kenyabu Clara

CPSO#: 87773

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 527-7575
Fax: (705) 527-7571 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2B-619B Prospect Blvd
Midland ON  L4R 0G3
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chabikuli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chabikuli ( CPSO# 86024 )
Dr. K. Mossanda Chabikuli ( CPSO# 87773 )

Business Address:
619 Prospect Blvd
Midland ON  L4R 0G3
Phone Number: 7055277575

Business Address:
Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
P O Box 790
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 527-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENYABU CLARA MOSSANDA CHABIKULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSSANDA CHABIKULI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2011