skip to content

Moss, Leslie Anne

CPSO#: 92192

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 19 Oct 2009 to 15 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2013