skip to content

Mosli, Mohammed Hisham A

CPSO#: 99931

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2013 to 07 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2013 to 02 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 29 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2014