skip to content

Mosam, Bashir Ahmed

CPSO#: 22150

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Aug 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Medical Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 07 Jun 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2019