skip to content

Mortera, Genevieve

CPSO#: 98039

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Capilano Medical Centre
5818 Terrace Rd NW
Edmonton
Alberta
Edmonton AB  T6A 3Y8
Phone: 780-761-3330
Fax: 780-756-5442

Additional Practice Location(s)

HealthSource Medical Clinic
Ground Floor
473 Dupont Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M6G 1Y6
Canada
Phone: 416-588-1888
Fax: 416-588-0388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MORTERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015