skip to content

Morrison, Allan Fairchild

CPSO#: 92284

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
Blenheim Medical Centre
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone: (519) 676-5592
Fax: (866) 539-6714 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allan F. Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morrison ( CPSO# 92284 )

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
Blenheim Medical Centre
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 676-5592

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active
 
            Dr.  Allan  Fairchild  Morrison  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.