skip to content

Morris, William Maxwell

CPSO#: 30681

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Dec 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Mar 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 1986