skip to content

Morris, Leanne Gale

CPSO#: 93674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Shamrakov, Leanne Gale (used until: 14 Jun 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Child and Teen Clinic G1
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C3E7
Phone: 4164696590
Fax: 4164696591 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Leanne Morris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Morris ( CPSO# 93674 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEANNE GALE MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2015