skip to content

Morriello, Florence Filomena

CPSO#: 87275

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Ferrara, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
T2-023
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York, ON M3M 0B2
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Florence Morriello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Morriello ( CPSO# 87275 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:02 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FLORENCE FILOMENA MORRIELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 13 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015