skip to content

Morin, Richard Henry

CPSO#: 91680

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC - Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone: (705) 220-5936 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: 6139697400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

QHC - Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Morin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD HENRY MORIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009