skip to content

Morin, Heather Ann

CPSO#: 86971

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces
Health Services Centre
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 945-1505
Fax: (613) 945-1509 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANN MORIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2009 to 07 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010