skip to content

Morgenstern, Daniel Alexander

CPSO#: 97363

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Sep 2016
EXPIRY DATE
28 Sep 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology/Oncology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Fax: 4168135327 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:29 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 19 Mar 2012 to 10 Jun 2012
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 11 Jun 2012 to 10 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 11 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Aug 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Daniel Alexander Morgenstern may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University of Toronto, in which Dr. Morgenstern holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Morgenstern  no longer holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Morgenstern's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Morgenstern's
                        certificate   of  registration,  following  consideration  of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  September  29,  2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 28, 2023.