skip to content

Morgan, Stephen Calvin Augustus

CPSO#: 94561

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital, Ouellett
Family Medicine
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital, Metropol
Family Medicine
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morgan ( CPSO# 94561 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CALVIN AUGUSTUS MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 21 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012